Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Environmental Research Center,, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Freund, Michael Bruce, against Does 1 To 100, First Fitness International, Inc., represented by Silverman, Daniel S., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time470 days |
This complaint was filed by the Environmental Research Center against First Fitness International, Inc. et al. The case number is CGC-13-532166 and the filing date is July 3, 2013. The complaint was served to First Fitness International, Inc. at thei...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 17, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST FITNESS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Date: August 01, 2013ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: September 23, 2014THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: *STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT*
Date: September 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2014 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-07-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 23, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And For Entry Of Consent Judgment; Memorandum Of Points & Authorities In Support Of Motion Matter on calendar on Tuesday, September 23,...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: *STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT* | |
September 23, 2014 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Approve Proposition 65 Settlement And For Entry Of Consent Judgment; Memorandum Of Points & Authorities In Support Of Motion
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-23-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. PLAINTIFF ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH CENTER'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED, NO OPPOSITION FILED AND THE MOTION COMPLIES WITH THE HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE. ORDER AND JUDGMENT SIGNED WITH THE MOVING PAPERS. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: SHERYL L. SAWYER, CSR # 5976 | |
August 18, 2014 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RYAN HOFFMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT AND FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 55864448) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH CENTER, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.