Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Borowitz, Isaac, Sued Erroneously As Isaac, Crandall, Angela M, Garvey, Stephen, Resnick, Gregory Russell, Rhyne, Dalano, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Idell, Richard Jay, against Borowitz, Isaac, Sued Erroneously As Isaac, Cox, Melissa, Crandall, Angela, Crandall, Angela M, Does 2 To 100, Inclusive, (total of 12) See All represented by Miyake, Steven Shunzo, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 24, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions306 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Case Cycle Time713 days |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AND SERVE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: November 25, 2013REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
Date: October 18, 2013NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 24, 2013ORDER ENTERING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: April 30, 2014REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: May 02, 2014OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE FOR WRIT FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANDALL, ANGELA M
Date: August 07, 2014AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE COX, MELISSA
Date: February 27, 2014DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT COX, MELISSA
Date: March 26, 2014ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AND SERVE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 08, 2014ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE
Date: December 16, 2014ORDER AND STIPULATION RE: EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING
Date: December 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2015 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-19-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 04, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
April 07, 2015 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-07-2015 CONTINUED TO MAY-19-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR GREGORY RESNICK TO DISMISS CROSS-COMPLAINT. *** NOTE: CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL DID NOT SIGN THE JAN-27-2015 DISMISSAL. *** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ALSO DISMISSING AS TO 2ND AMENDED X-COMPLAINT OF OCT. 08, 2014 AND X-COMPLAINT OF FEB. 11, 2014. (TRANSACTION ID # 56671000) AS TO DEFENDANT CRANDALL, ANGELA AN INDIVIDUAL SMITH, CHRISTINA RHYNE, DALANO BOROWITZ, ISAAC, SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS ISAAC (SURNAME UNKNOWN) | |
January 20, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
January 16, 2015 | Hearing |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SETTLEMENT ATTORNEY 1 |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-16-2015 NOT HELD AND REMOVED. CASE SETTLED PRIOR TO MSC. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON APR-07-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (2.0) | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-04-2015 - CASE SETTLED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.