Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Frank, Mary Glaspie, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Hanson, Christopher Dn, Norman, Tiffany, Oliver, Keith R, Pro Per, against Bank Of America, N.A., Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Glaspie, Arnold Melvin, Recontrust Company, Recontrust Company, N.A., Erroneously Sued As, (total of 5) See All represented by Al-Marhoon, Lila Y., Brys, Laura G., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions516 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Case Cycle Time2094 days |
This complaint is a summons issued in a legal case filed by Mary Glaspie Frank against Bank of America, N.A. and Arnold. The summons notifies the defendants that they have been sued and that the court may decide against them if they do not respond wi...
ORDER AND JOINT STIPULATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 11, 2014ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: July 08, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF FRANK, MARY GLASPIE
Date: February 04, 2016NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 16318030) FILED BY ATTORNEY HANSON, CHRISTOPHER DN
Date: November 14, 2016ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL. (AMENDED)
Date: July 10, 2015ORDER AND JOINT STIPULATION TO POSTPONE THE HEARING ON THE DEMURRER
Date: February 17, 2015CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-03-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 14, 2018NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 20, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 17065075) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANK, MARY GLASPIE
Date: March 08, 2017ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO POSTPONE THE HEARING ON THE DEMURRER
Date: May 20, 2014ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S TNIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2015MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS
Date: September 12, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF FRANK, MARY GLASPIE
Date: September 13, 2017ANSWER TO 5TH AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17267032) FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Date: September 25, 2017ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 20, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-03-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100043669) | |
July 23, 2018 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR ON JUL-23-2018. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON OCT-03-2018 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF SETTLEMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206) | |
May 03, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Action For Failure To Prosecute And Bring The Matter To Trial; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Thurs...
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
May 03, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Action For Failure To Prosecute And Bring The Matter To Trial; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-03-2018 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL. IN LIGHT OF THE NOTICE OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT, THE COURT VACATES THE TENTATIVE RULING AND TAKES THE MOTION OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON, CLERK: E. LARNAUTI, NOT REPORTED | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PARTIAL SETTLMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61976490) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANK, MARY GLASPIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.