Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bernstein, Susan, Gutfeld, Steve, Moran, Michael, Whitney, Marty, Williams, Patricia, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Bennett, John K., Carp, Dylan B, Ching-Senaha, Cara, Costin, Anne, Dolan, Christopher B., (total of 9) See All against Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Gutfeld, Steve, Howell, Anita, Tanner, Linda, Williams, Patricia, (total of 8) See All represented by Bennett, John K., Carp, Dylan B, Ching-Senaha, Cara, Costin, Anne, Dolan, Christopher B., (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 16, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions535 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
VerdictPlaintiff |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1462 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case with the case number CGC 12-526187. The plaintiff, Patricia Williams, is requesting the dismissal of the case against the defendant, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, et al. The request for dismissa...
RULINGS DENYING DEFENDANTS' POST-TRIAL DISCLOSURE REQUESTS.
Date: February 03, 2017ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION OWNERSHIP
Date: October 30, 2013NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY TOOR, PUNEET
Date: July 08, 2014RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNSTEIN, SUSAN
Date: October 16, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15315038) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: November 12, 2015RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF GUTFELD, STEVE
Date: June 26, 2013ORDER FOR COMMISSION FOR ISSUANCE OF OUT OF STATE SUBPOENA
Date: September 01, 2016STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 07, 2014JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 55113663) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: March 07, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16032017) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: February 02, 2016ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION OWNERSHIP
Date: April 07, 2014ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC.
Date: April 07, 2014EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: November 23, 2016ORDER FOR COMMISSION FOR ISSUANCE OF OUT OF STATE SUBPOENA
Date: July 07, 2015WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: November 23, 2016EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: November 23, 2016ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (CCP SEC. 1021.5)
Date: April 28, 2017NOTE RECEIVED DURING TRIAL
Date: November 17, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-01-2016 8:45 AM
Date: November 01, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-04-2016 8:45 AM
Date: November 04, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-03-2016 8:45 AM
Date: November 03, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-09-2016 8:45 AM
Date: November 09, 2016MINUTES FOR OCT-27-2016 8:45 AM
Date: October 27, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2016 8:45 AM
Date: November 08, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-07-2016 8:45 AM
Date: November 07, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 17054035) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: February 24, 2017MINUTES FOR OCT-28-2016 8:45 AM
Date: October 28, 2016ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR ADMONITION.
Date: November 02, 2016MINUTES FOR OCT-26-2016 8:45 AM
Date: October 26, 2016MINUTES FOR OCT-25-2016 8:45 AM
Date: October 25, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WITNESS ARLENE RICHARDSON.
Date: October 21, 2016MINUTES FOR OCT-24-2016 8:45 AM
Date: October 24, 2016MINUTES FOR OCT-21-2016 2:30 PM
Date: October 21, 2016MINUTES FOR OCT-20-2016 9:00 AM
Date: October 20, 2016STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR POS-TRIAL MOTIONS.
Date: January 20, 2017STATEMENT OF DECISION RE BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200 TRIAL PHASE.
Date: January 19, 2017PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION RE BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS COSE 17200 TRIAL PHASE.
Date: January 09, 2017MINUTES FOR OCT-18-2016 9:00 AM
Date: October 18, 2016TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 59709613) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: October 17, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16241032) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: August 29, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16245050) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: September 02, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE 2- WITHDRAWN (TRANSACTION ID # 59709072)
Date: October 17, 2016ORDER DENYING WYNDHAM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: August 08, 2016ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART WYNDHAM DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: September 16, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16259065) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: September 16, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16252066) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: September 09, 2016ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS' MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 3295(C)
Date: September 16, 2016NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY TOOR, PUNEET
Date: October 01, 2014DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT TANNER, LINDA
Date: July 08, 2014ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: March 04, 2014RECORD REMANDED BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT
Date: February 04, 2014SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA GUTFELD, STEVE
Date: January 25, 2013STIPULATION TO ADR; (TRANSACTION ID # 16039015) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: February 09, 2016NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 16, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16103025) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, PATRICIA
Date: April 13, 2016JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: November 17, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-17-2016 8:30 AM
Date: November 17, 2016JURY QUESTIONS RECEIVED DURING DELIBERATIONS
Date: November 17, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-15-2016 9:00 AM
Date: November 15, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-16-2016 9:00 AM
Date: November 16, 2016ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND THE RELATED REQUEST FOR STAY A149782 DIV 3
Date: November 14, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-10-2016 8:45 AM
Date: November 10, 2016MINUTES FOR NOV-14-2016 8:45 AM
Date: November 14, 2016PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: November 17, 2016CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: July 06, 2017JURY INSTRUCTION - PHASE II
Date: November 17, 2016JURY VERDICT
Date: November 17, 2016NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT
Date: June 12, 2017CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 05, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-02-2016 9:00 AM
Date: November 02, 2016MINUTES FOR OCT-31-2016 8:45 AM
Date: October 31, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17022048)
Date: January 24, 2017ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARILY STAYING ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT.
Date: January 20, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17093004)
Date: April 04, 2017REMITTITUR DISMISSED A151524 DIV 3
Date: December 13, 2017ORDER DETERMINING PLAINTIFF'S PREVALING PARTY COSTS.
Date: March 10, 2017RULINGS ON DEFENDANTS' POST-TRIAL MOTIONS.
Date: March 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2018 | Hearing | PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JOHN K. BENNETT | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | MAR-14-2018 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY JOHN K. BENNETT - OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON DEC-18-2017 | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61478926) | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED A151524 DIV 3 | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, 24 VOLS RT (APPEAL FILED 4/3/17, A151524 DIV 3) | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (CCP SEC. 1021.5) (TRANSACTION ID # 60547819) FILED BY DEFENDANT WYNDHAM VACATION OWNERSHIP | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $775.00 RE 34662 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO COURT OF APPEAL, DOC #1908280439, WARRANT #38204840, DATED MAY-01-2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.