Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Held, Ph.D, Anthony, filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case represented by Chanler, Clifford A, against Does 1 To 50, University Art Center, Inc., represented by Tong, Albert, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
Case Cycle Time345 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint document in a legal case. The case number is CGC-12-523956 and it was filed by Ronnie Otero. The plaintiff/petitioner is Anthony Held, Ph.D and the defendant/respondent is University Art C...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 05, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY ART CENTER, INC.
Date: December 04, 2012ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: June 21, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2013 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-03-2013 VACATED. JUDGMENT UPON PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT FILED 6/21/13. (206) | |
June 21, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Ntc Of Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter Judgment Matter on calendar for Friday, June 21, 2013, Line 9, PLAINTIFF ANTHONY HELD, PH.D's Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter Judgm...
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
June 21, 2013 | Hearing |
Ntc Of Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter Judgment
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT UPON PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, RULING - THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. PLAINTIFF ANTHONY HELD, PH.D'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROP 65 SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT IS GRANTED, FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN. NO OPPOSITION FILED. ORDER AND JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: ANTHONY VAUGHN, CSR # 6185 | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-21-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
June 07, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Ntc Of Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter Judgment Set for hearing on Friday, June 7, 2013, Line 18, PLAINTIFF ANTHONY HELD, PH.D Notice Of Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter J...
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
June 07, 2013 | Hearing |
Ntc Of Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter Judgment
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.