Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brimer, Russell, filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case represented by Chanler, Clifford A, against Does 1 To 150, Vandor Llc, represented by Williams, Jeffrey Reed, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
Case Cycle Time137 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-12-523859 and it was filed by Maryann E. Moran on October 17, 2012. The plaintiff, Russell Brimer, is suing Vandor LLC and D...
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT
Date: January 02, 2013AMENDED POS TO VANDOR LLC 'S ANSWER TO PLTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VANDOR LLC
Date: October 17, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VANDOR LLC
Date: October 11, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2013 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-30-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 02, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
Ntc Of Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter Judgment Matter on calendar for Wednesday, January 2, 2013, Line 6, PLAINTIFF RUSSELL BRIMER's Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter Judg...
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT | |
January 02, 2013 | Hearing |
Ntc Of Motion To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Enter Judgment
Judge: MARLA J. MILLER |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-02-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT UPON PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT) | |
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, JUDGE MILLER DISCLOSED THAT SHE & MR. MAHONEY ARE BOTH MEMBERS OF THE INN OF COURT. SHE DOES NOT VIEW THIS AS A BASIS FOR HER RECUSAL TO BE FAIR AND IMPARTIAL. NO OBJECTIONS WERE MADE. PLAINTIFF RUSSELL BRIMER'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROP 65 SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE SETTLEMENT MEETS THE CRITERIA OF THE HEALTH & SAFTEY CODE. THE REIMBURSEMENT OF ATTORNEYS FEE, COST AND THE CIVIL PENALTY ARE REASONABLE. ORDER AND JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR # 5976 | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | NTC OF MOTION TO APPROVE PROP 65 SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIMER, RUSSELL HEARING SET FOR JAN-02-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIMER, RUSSELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.