Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Velasquez, Rodolfo, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Davis, Russell, Pro Per, against America'S Wholesale Lender, Bank Of America, N.A., (Erroneously Sued As Bank, Bank Of America, N.A. (Erroneously Sued As Bank Of, Bank Of America National Association, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Greene, C. Scott, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Katherine Feinstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine Feinstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Case Cycle Time140 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CGC-12-522638 and it was filed by Rodolfo Velasquez against Bank of America National Association et al. The document includes information about the attorney and party invol...
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: September 21, 2012OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, RODOLFO
Date: September 21, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 24, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, RODOLFO
Date: July 24, 2012ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ANDPAYMENT OF $17,868 BOND
Date: September 07, 2012MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, RODOLFO
Date: September 20, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF VELASQUEZ, RODOLFO
Date: September 20, 2012ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2012DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2012 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-26-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., DBA AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT | |
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) | |
November 09, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Unlawful Detainer Law and Motion Calendar for Friday, November 9, 2012, line 3 - DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'s DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. Sustain with leave to amend, plaintiff t...
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
November 09, 2012 | Hearing |
DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-09-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501 | |
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS SUSTAINED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, PLAINTIFF TO ALLEGE TENDER, BREACH OF ENFORCEABLE IMPLIED CONTRACT, LEGAL DUTY OF CARE AND FRAUD WITH PARTICULARITY; OTHER CAUSE OF ACTION STAND OR FALL ON ISSUES ADDRESSED ABOVE. PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 10 DAYS. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, CLERK: M. SMITH, NOT REPORTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.