Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Equable Ascent Financial, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clinnin, John, against Does 1 To 10, Guglielmelli, John B, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 12, 2012 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions312 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10
Date: May 20, 2013DECLARATION RE: INTEREST
Date: May 20, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 200013333): WINN, BRIAN N SUBSTITUTED FOR BULLOCK, MANDIE AS ATTORNEY FOR CAVALRY SPV I, LLC | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT GUGLIELMELLI, JOHN B | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $254.43 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT GUGLIELMELLI, JOHN B | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ASSIGNEE CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT GUGLIELMELLI, JOHN B | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO ASSIGNEE CAVALRY SPV I, LLC | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT FILED BY PLAINTIFF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT GUGLIELMELLI, JOHN B $2,933.82 PRINCIPAL, $419.57 INTEREST, $290.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,643.39, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.