Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Neustedter, Laura, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Panto, Arcolina, Pro Per, against Does 1 To 5, Inclusive, Irene Lieberman Dba The Monroe Residence Club, Lieberman, Irene, Lieberman, Irene, Individually And Dba The Monroe, The Granada, Inc., A Caliornia Corporation, (total of 6) See All represented by Lieberman, Richard Michael, Rosenberg, Richard D., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 28, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions417 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time494 days |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Laura Neustedter against The Granada, Inc., a California corporation, and others. The case number is CGC-12-521965 and was filed on August 19, 2013. The plaintiff is represented by attorney Stephen M. Kappos. T...
MINUTES FOR OCT-24-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 24, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-22-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 22, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-15-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 15, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 19, 2014MINUTES FOR OCT-23-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 23, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-03-2013 9:30 AM
Date: October 03, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-11-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 11, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-09-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 09, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-21-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 21, 2013NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: July 15, 2014MINUTES FOR
Date: October 04, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-17-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 17, 2013WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: November 05, 2013EXHIBITS LIST FILED
Date: November 05, 2013MINUTES FOR NOV-05-2013 2:00 PM
Date: November 05, 2013NOTICE OF COURT DECISION -TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION
Date: January 31, 2014EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: November 05, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-10-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 10, 2013PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 21, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-16-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 16, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-08-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 08, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-29-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 29, 2013JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN
Date: November 01, 2013JURY VERDICT PLAINTIFF NUESTEDTER VERSUS DEFENDANT IRENE LIEBERMAN, DBA MONROE RESIDENCE CLUB
Date: November 04, 2013MINUTES FOR NOV-04-2013 9:00 AM
Date: November 04, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-28-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 28, 2013PLAINTIFF'SPROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 28, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-31-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 31, 2013MINUTES FOR NOV-01-2013 9:00 AM
Date: November 01, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-30-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 30, 2013MINUTES FOR JAN-16-2014 1:30 PM
Date: January 16, 2014MINUTES FOR OCT-25-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 25, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: August 23, 2012JURY QUESTIONS RECEIVED DURING TRIAL
Date: November 01, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-07-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 07, 2013EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: November 05, 2013MINUTES FOR DEC-20-2013 11:00 AM
Date: December 20, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LIEBERMAN, IRENE, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA THE MONROE
Date: September 26, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GRANADA, INC., A CALIORNIA CORPORATION
Date: September 26, 2012ORDER MINUTE ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO SERVE WRITTEN NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2013ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT ROY PRESCOTT'S DEMURRER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2013ORDER RULING ON POST TRIAL MOTIONS
Date: February 04, 20145 MOTIONS IN LIMINE FILED BY DEFENDANT LIEBERMAN, IRENE, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA THE MONROE
Date: October 03, 2013APPENDIX TO ORDER RULING ON POST-TIRAL MOTIONS
Date: February 05, 2014PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: October 07, 2013NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: March 17, 2014ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 3/17/14 A141330 DIV 5
Date: October 24, 2014REMITTITUR DISMISSED (APPEAL FILED 3/17/2014; A141330 DIV. 5)
Date: December 24, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED (APPEAL FILED 3/17/2014; A141330 DIV. 5) | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 3/17/14 A141330 DIV 5 | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING - THE COURT GRANTS LAURA NEUSTEDTER'S REQUEST FOR PREPARING AND CERIFYING CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FOR APPEAL ONLY. | |
April 09, 2014 | Hearing |
HEARING ORDERED FOR APPLICATION OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON APR-09-2014 IN 206, HEARING ON APPLICANT/APPELLANT LAURA NEUSTEDTER'S WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS. APPEARANCE BY APPLICANT WITH COUNSEL ARCOLINA PATO. AN AMENDED REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED IN OPEN COURT. THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED AS TO CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FOR APPEAL ONLY. THE APPLICATIONS OF WAIVERS WHICH WERE PREVIOUSLY UNAUTHORIZED TO GRANT COURT REPORTERS' FEE AND COSTS ARE REVERSED. ORDER SIGNED, AND ENDORSED-FILED COPY MAILED TO APPLICANT. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | DIRECTORY NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT PURSUANT TO TRANSCRIPT REIMBURSEMENT FUND APPLICATION | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING ORDERED FOR APPLICATION OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY APPELLANT NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR APR-09-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206 | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY APPELLANT NEUSTEDTER, LAURA AN INDIVIDUAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.