Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Series Agi North Hollywood Of Appian Group, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Singer, Jr., Edward C., against Handel, Mark, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Katherine Feinstein presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 11, 2012 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2119 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Series AGI North Hollywood of Appian Group Investors DE, LLC against Mark Handel. The complaint states that Mark Handel is being sued by the plaintiff and that the court may decide against him if he does no...
ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION
Date: May 24, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 11, 2012CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-10-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 25, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 100032552) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SERIES AGI NORTH HOLLYWOOD OF APPIAN GROUP INVESTORS DE, LLC, A DELAWARE SERIES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT HANDEL, MARK | |
October 10, 2012 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-10-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION | |
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIP FILED BY PLAINTIFF SERIES AGI NORTH HOLLYWOOD OF APPIAN GROUP INVESTORS DE, LLC, A DELAWARE SERIES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SERIES AGI NORTH HOLLYWOOD OF APPIAN GROUP INVESTORS DE, LLC, A DELAWARE SERIES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HANDEL, MARK $20,000,000.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $20,000,000.00, (PLUS INTEREST AT 6% PER ANNUM) SEE SCANNED DOC | |
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SERIES AGI NORTH HOLLYWOOD OF APPIAN GROUP INVESTORS DE, LLC, A DELAWARE SERIES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT HANDEL, MARK | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SERIES AGI NORTH HOLLYWOOD OF APPIAN GROUP INVESTORS DE, LLC, A DELAWARE SERIES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT HANDEL, MARK SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-10-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-10-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-25-2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.