Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tsai, Kimberlee Rae, Winn, Brian N, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Poole, James L, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 19, 2011 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions322 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2616 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a case between Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC and James L Poole et al. The document provides details of the service of the summons and complaint to James L Poole. The service was made ...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE
Date: September 05, 2012ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT.
Date: August 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100228572): TSAI, KIMBERLEE RAE SUBSTITUTED FOR WINN, BRIAN N AS ATTORNEY FOR CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF RIVERWALK HOLDINGS LTD, AS ASSIGNEE OF CHASE/WASHINGTON MUTUAL | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT POOLE, JAMES L AKA JAMES POOLE | |
August 29, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Vacate Renewal Of Judgment
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT. | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES POOLE; DECLARATION OF GERRY GOLDSHOLLE FILED BY DEFENDANT POOLE, JAMES L AKA JAMES POOLE | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW & MOTION, DEPT. 302, AS TO THE AUG-29-2022 HEARING RE: DEFENDANT JAMES POOLE'S MOTION TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT, THE COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING. UNOPPOSED MOTION GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR.; CLERK: SEAN KANE; NOT REPORTED. (302/RBU) | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-29-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ON APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210011751) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF RIVERWALK HOLDINGS LTD, AS ASSIGNEE OF CHASE/WASHINGTON MUTUAL SERVED JUL-15-2022, MAIL AS TO DEFENDANT POOLE, JAMES L AKA JAMES POOLE PROCESS COMPLETED BY DEFAULT SECTION. WRIT MAY ISSUE ON AUG-22-2022 IF NO MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, PARTIALLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 210011318) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF RIVERWALK HOLDINGS LTD, AS ASSIGNEE OF CHASE/WASHINGTON MUTUAL AS TO DEFENDANT POOLE, JAMES L AKA JAMES POOLE | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | POS RE: NTC OF MTN TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JDUGMENT; MEMO OF P & A; ETC FILED BY DEFENDANT POOLE, JAMES L AKA JAMES POOLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.