Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Department Stores National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael Scott, against Chow, Pancy, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time2122 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint document in a legal case between Department Stores National Bank and Pancy Chow. The document includes information about the case number, filing date, and the attorneys representing each p...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 100023514) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK AS TO PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK | |
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, PANCY | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $158.22 INTEREST, $46.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, PANCY | |
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $284.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CHOW, PANCY | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CHOW, PANCY $6,209.85 PRINCIPAL, $284.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,493.85, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: 1) INTEREST 2) COSTS (CCP 1033) 3) ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK | |
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (610) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.