Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sutardja, Sehat, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Leon, Jeffrey Alan, Smith, Glenn Arthur, against Franchise Tax Board, An Agency Of The State Of, represented by Stricklin, Marguerite Celeste, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1037 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CGC-11-515645 and it was filed on August 21, 2014. The plaintiff is Sehat Sutardja and the defendant is the Franchise Tax Board, an agency of the State of California. The r...
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTARDJA, SEHAT
Date: March 23, 2012ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF SEHAT SUTARDJA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2014MEMO IN OPPOS TO DEFTS DEMURRER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTARDJA, SEHAT
Date: April 13, 2012DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2014SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTARDJA, SEHAT
Date: March 23, 2012MINUTES FOR MAY-25-2012 9:30 AM
Date: May 25, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SUTARDJA, SEHAT
Date: December 15, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 03, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2014 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING PLTF'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD, AN AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA | |
September 04, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion; Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings The matter is on calendar for Thursday, September 4, 2014, Line 4, DEFENDANTS FRANCHISE TAX BOARD, AN AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S Notice ...
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
September 04, 2014 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion; Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings
Judge: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH |
|
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-04-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
September 04, 2014 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS FRANCHISE TAX BOARD, AN AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS OFF CALENDAR AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE: ERNEST GOLDSMITH, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT, NOT REPORTED. =302/EHG | |
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF SEHAT SUTARDJA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-08-2014 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 8/21/14. (206) | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FOR PERMISSION TO FILE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANCHISE TAX BOARD, AN AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.