Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie Ann, Walsh, Mark D, against Alvarez, Norma L. P.O. Box, Does 1 To 10, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2011 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1002 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2155 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a case between Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. and Norma L. Alvarez. The case number is CGC-11-513941 and the filing date is December 2, 2014. The document includes information about the attorney representing ...
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.
Date: June 01, 2012DECLARATION OF ATTORNEYS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.
Date: June 01, 2012WITNESS AND EVIDENCE REQ FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.
Date: April 30, 2012DECLARATION OF ANDREW RUNDQUIST FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.
Date: June 01, 2012GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT ALVAREZ, NORMA L.
Date: September 16, 2011DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10
Date: December 02, 2014TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.
Date: June 01, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100019842): HENRIQUES, JANALIE ANN SUBSTITUTED FOR WALSH, MARK D AS ATTORNEY FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. | |
April 04, 2017 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-04-2017 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 14, 2017 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-14-2017 CONTINUED TO APR-04-2017 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT ALVAREZ, NORMA L. | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ALVAREZ, NORMA L. | |
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $.00 INTEREST, $262.95 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100015015) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT ALVAREZ, NORMA L. | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ALVAREZ, NORMA L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.