Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert S, against Does 1 To 10, Fields, Robert E., Porter, Iesha S., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Katherine Feinstein presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 01, 2011 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions394 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2667 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-18-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 06, 2012NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210009214)
Date: June 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 210009214) FILED BY ATTORNEY KENNARD, ROBERT S | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210009214) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AS TO DEFENDANT FIELDS, ROBERT E. PORTER, IESHA S. NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FIELDS, ROBERT E. PORTER, IESHA S. $3,061.40 PRINCIPAL, $2,656.49 INTEREST, $45.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,762.89, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COST BILL, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED ($.00 ON INTEREST, $.00 ON PRINCIPAL), $2,656.49 INTEREST, $372.50 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 210009214) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210009214) | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT FIELDS, ROBERT E. PORTER, IESHA S. | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT FIELDS, ROBERT E. PORTER, IESHA S. | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,376.97 INTEREST, $372.50 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 17045005) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT FIELDS, ROBERT E. PORTER, IESHA S. | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT FIELDS, ROBERT E. PORTER, IESHA S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.