Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nicholaw, Andy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Per, against Board Of Supervisors, City & County Of San, represented by Clements, Owen James, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Tomar Mason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTomar Mason Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2011 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (Fraud In Law; Fraud On The Court Impairment Of Contract) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions67 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time136 days |
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF ERROR AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 16, 2011CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-14-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 29, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: TOMAR MASON |
|
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-14-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF ERROR AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT | |
August 18, 2011 | Hearing |
Petition For Writ Of Error Motion For Relief From The Judgment
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COURT ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF NICHOLAW, ANDY | |
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR AUG-18-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301 | |
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ANDY NICHOLAW'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF ERROR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF DID NOT BRING TO COURT A PROPER PROOF OF SERVICE ATTESTING TO SERVICE THAT COMPLIES WITH CCP 1005. PLAINTIFF WAS ADVISED TO READ CCP 391(B)(2) AND 1008 AND CRC 3.1112. AFTER THE HEARING, PLAINTIFF ANDY NICHOLAW'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF ERROR AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE JUDGMENT IS DENIED BECAUSE IS PROCEDURALLY IMPROPER, HAS NO PROOF OF SERVICE AND HAS NO MERIT. DEFENDANT IS TO SUBMIT A FORM OF ORDER. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER, CAROL A. KAREN, CSR # 8189 (301) | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED AND JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $410.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE SEP-04-2011, FILED BY DEFENDANT BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, CITY & COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.