Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael Scott, Walsh, Mark D, against Bavaro, Shannon M., Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2011 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions185 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2373 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a case between Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. and Shannon M. Bavaro. The document provides details of the service of the summons and complaint to Shannon M. Bavaro. The service was made by...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100019840): HUNT, MICHAEL SCOTT SUBSTITUTED FOR WALSH, MARK D AS ATTORNEY FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. | |
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BAVARO, SHANNON M. $4,718.52 PRINCIPAL, $825.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $537.18 INTEREST, $289.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,370.20, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, COURT JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $289.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT BAVARO, SHANNON M. | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION MARK WALSH FILED RE: MEMORANDUM SUPPORTING COMPETENCY OF WITNESS TO TESTIFY TO THE CONTENTS OF THE PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT (EVIDENCE CODE 1271) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION MARK D. WALSH FILED RE: INTEREST, CCP 1033(B)(2)NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR USE OF COPIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION GARRETT MAGRUDER FILED RE: (CCP 585(D)) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.