Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City And County Of San Francisco, Ford, Thaddeus, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weiss, William Edward, against Does 1 To 25, Dollar Rental Car Finance Co., Dtg Operations, Inc., Feijoo-Llanes, Jose F, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2011 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-11-507247 and the filing date is January 11, 2011. The plaintiff, Thaddeus Ford, is suing DTG Operations, Inc., Dollar Renta...
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 01, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 11, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-10-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | RELEASE OF MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT LIEN FILED BY CLAIMANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT LIEN SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CODE SEC 124 | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FORD, THADDEUS AS TO DEFENDANT DTG OPERATIONS, INC. DOLLAR RENTAL CAR FINANCE CO. FEIJOO-LLANES, JOSE F DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-10-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-14-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-26-2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.