Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Martin, Lee, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints (Failure To Compensate For All Hours Worked) case represented by Vinogradsky, Julieanna I., against Allen William Kuehn, D B A San Francisco Fish, Does 1 Thoruogh 10, Inclusive, represented by Simpson, Paul Vincent, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2011 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (Failure To Compensate For All Hours Worked) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions66 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time141 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case. The case number is CGC-11-507178 and the filing date is Feb-01-2011. The plaintiff, Lee Martin, is suing the defendant, Allen William Kuehn, who does business as San Franc...
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: April 18, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 10, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-10-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO CAUSES OT ACTION UNDER CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 2698-2699.5 (PAGA) | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLEN WILLIAM KUEHN, D/B/A SAN FRANCISCO FISH COMPANY | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTIN, LEE SERVED JAN-31-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT ALLEN WILLIAM KUEHN, D/B/A SAN FRANCISCO FISH COMPANY | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTIN, LEE AS TO DEFENDANT ALLEN WILLIAM KUEHN, D/B/A SAN FRANCISCO FISH COMPANY DOES 1 THORUOGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-10-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-11-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-26-2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.