Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Orea, Alfredo, filed a(n) Declaratory Relief case represented by Friedman, Todd M., against Hsbc Card Services, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2011 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions123 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time141 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Alfredo Orea against HSBC Card Services, Inc. The document is a summons, notifying the defendant that they are being sued by the plaintiff. It states that the defendant has 30 calendar days to respond to th...
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OREA, ALFREDO
Date: March 28, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 10, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-10-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 19, 2011 | Hearing |
PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON APR-19-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OREA, ALFREDO | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR APR-19-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 610 | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATORY RELIEF, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OREA, ALFREDO AS TO DEFENDANT HSBC CARD SERVICES, INC. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-10-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-11-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-26-2011 | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.