Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cerrato, Naomi Gerada, Espinosa, Carlos, filed a(n) Civil Rights case represented by Cook, Walter Curtis, against City And County Of San Francsco, A Municipal, Does 1 To 25, Gaynor, Michael, Inspector Velarde, Star #2209, Swat, Michael, (total of 5) See All represented by Russi, Bradley, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2011 |
CategoryCivil Rights |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time145 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint document in a legal case. It is filed by Carlos Espinosa and Noemi Gerada against the City and County of San Francisco and other individuals. The case number is CGC-11-507063 and the filin...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-10-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR NOTICE OF REMOVAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCSCO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCSCO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCSCO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | |
April 19, 2011 | Hearing |
PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON APR-19-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOSA, CARLOS CERRATO, NAOMI GERADA SERVED APR-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCSCO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR APR-19-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 610 | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESPINOSA, CARLOS CERRATO, NAOMI GERADA AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCSCO, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION GAYNOR, MICHAEL INSPECTOR VELARDE, STAR #2209 SWAT, MICHAEL DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-10-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-07-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-26-2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.