Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pipkins, Gloria, Pipkins, Ida, Pipkins, Jerry, Pipkins, Rita, Pipkins, Thomas, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Alexander, Mary, against Does 1-100, Inclusive, Does 1 To 10, Incl., Kindred Healthcare, Inc., Kindred Healthcare Operating Inc., A Corporation, Kindred Nursing Centers West Llc, (total of 9) See All represented by Canvel, Henry P, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Non-Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions243 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Case Cycle Time1059 days |
This complaint is a first amended complaint for damages filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiffs in this case are Rita Pipkins, Gloria Pipkins, Jerry Pipkins, and Thomas Pipkins, who are the successors in int...
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
Date: December 04, 2012ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 06, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 29, 2010ORDER VACATING TRIAL AND ASSOCIATES DATES
Date: January 19, 2012DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2013 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-17-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIPKINS, IDA BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 09, 2013 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-09-2013. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WAS FILED ON 8/2/13. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON DEC-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT , CONDITIONAL, FILED BY PLAINTIFF PIPKINS, IDA BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM PIPKINS, RITA PIPKINS, GLORIA PIPKINS, JERRY PIPKINS, THOMAS | |
June 17, 2013 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event | FEE FOR CONFIDENTIALITY STIP RE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS PRODUCED IN DISCO FILED BY DEFENDANT KINDRED NURSING CENTERS WEST LLC DBA KINDRED TRANSITIONAL CARE AND REHABILITATION - TUNNELL CENTER | |
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event | FEE FOR CONFIDENTIALITY STIP RE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS PRODUCED IN DISCO FILED BY DEFENDANT KINDRED NURSING CENTERS WEST LLC DBA GOLDEN GATE HEALLTHCARE CENTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.