Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Global Acceptance Credit Company L.P., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brewer, Lance A, against Does 1 To 20, Zandinejad, Behnam, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a case between Global Acceptance Credit Company L.P. and Behnam Zandinejad. The document includes information about the case number, filing date, and the attorney representing the plain...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT ZANDINEJAD, BEHNAM INDIVIDUALLY | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ZANDINEJAD, BEHNAM INDIVIDUALLY | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $11,154.24 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100040022) FILED BY ASSIGNEE JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100040022): COLCLOUGH, III, ROBERT J. SUBSTITUTED FOR BREWER, LANCE A AS ATTORNEY FOR JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC | |
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ASSIGNEE JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT ZANDINEJAD, BEHNAM INDIVIDUALLY | |
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF GLOBAL ACCEPTANCE CREDIT COMPANY L.P. | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 20 | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF GLOBAL ACCEPTANCE CREDIT COMPANY L.P. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ZANDINEJAD, BEHNAM INDIVIDUALLY $9,875.77 PRINCIPAL, $1,325.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $4,291.22 INTEREST, $290.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $15,781.99, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; USE OF COPIES ; 1033;1717; REQUEST FOR INTEREST AND FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF GLOBAL ACCEPTANCE CREDIT COMPANY L.P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.