Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael Scott, against Zepeda, Ana E., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions109 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2303 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint document in a case between Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and Ana E. Zepeda. The case number is CGC-10-506685 and the filing date is Jan-04-2011. The document indicates that the summons and ...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $3,723.50 AS TO DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, ANA E. | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 100012152) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, ANA E. | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, ANA E. | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $355.99 INTEREST, $46.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $284.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, ANA E. | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: 1, INTEREST 2. COSTS 3. ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, ANA E. $3,366.35 PRINCIPAL, $400.28 INTEREST, $284.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,050.63, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
November 03, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (610) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.