Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael Scott, against Olevsky, Russell A, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions893 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1826 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a case between Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and Russell A Olevsky. The document provides information about the service of the summons and complaint to the defendant. It states that the ...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2016 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-05-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM SHORT CAUSE TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-26-2011 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JAN-05-2016 AT 10:00 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. | |
September 26, 2011 | Hearing |
SHORT CAUSE TRIAL
Judge: ELLEN CHAITIN |
|
September 26, 2011 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR SEP-26-2011 11:00 AM FOR DEPT 514 | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF SEP-26-2011 ASSIGNED TO SHORT CAUSE TRIAL CALENDAR ON SEP-26-2011 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 514, ELLEN CHAITIN, TO PUT THE TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT ON THE RECORD. THE CASE SETTLED WITH THE JUDGE PRO TEM. (206) | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PLTF IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY AT TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.