Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Escamilla, Octavio, Limon, Melva, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Molinari, Gino Joseph, against Cohen, Jeffrey, Collins, Jeffrey, Collins, Jeffrey C., Does 1 To 25, Powell, Katherine E., (total of 5) See All represented by Hawkyard, Edgar William, Marzan, James Mapanao, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions209 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time242 days |
PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE AUG-04-2011.
Date: July 25, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 23, 2010SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF LIMON, MELVA ESCAMILLA, OCTAVIO
Date: December 27, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT POWELL, KATHERINE E. COLLINS, JEFFREY
Date: April 04, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2011 | Hearing |
PRE-ARBITRATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 22, 2011 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM PRE-ARBITRATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-06-2011 - DISMISSAL ON FILE. | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ARBITRATION CALENDAR LIST OF AUG-04-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 04, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO ARBITRATION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND POS FILED BY DEFENDANT POWELL, KATHERINE E. COHEN, JEFFREY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS JEFFREY C. COLLINS | |
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event | PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE AUG-04-2011. | |
July 25, 2011 | Hearing |
ASSIGN TO ARBITRATION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 27, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR JUL-25-2011. PRE-ARBITRATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEP-06-2011 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 610. MAY-27-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.