Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Synnex Corporation, A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Glassberg, Harold Burton, against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, The Britter Group, Inc., A Corporation, Williams, Amy E, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time357 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case between Inex Corporation and The Britter Group, Inc. The case number is CGC-10-506557 and the filing date is October 6, 2011. The document includes information about the at...
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE
Date: October 06, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SYNNEX CORPORATION, A CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT THE BRITTER GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION WILLIAMS, AMY E $21,044.00 PRINCIPAL, $1,000.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $4,629.48 INTEREST, $595.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $27,268.48, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (610) | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYNNEX CORPORATION, A CORPORATION SERVED JAN-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT THE BRITTER GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT, COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $595.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT THE BRITTER GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION WILLIAMS, AMY E | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST CALCULATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYNNEX CORPORATION, A CORPORATION | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF HAROLD B. GLASSBERG REGARDING ORIGINAL CREDITORS DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYNNEX CORPORATION, A CORPORATION | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER IN SUPPORT OF SUBSTITUTION OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SYNNEX CORPORATION, A CORPORATION | |
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.