Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Daquioag, Richard, Yoder, Kenneth, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Wolford, Jason N, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Vigil, Brian, represented by Bornstein, Jonathan H, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryQuiet Title - Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions246 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Case Cycle Time266 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: August 09, 2011ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT VIGIL, BRIAN
Date: March 01, 2011PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE MAY-12-2011.
Date: May 02, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 06, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2011 | Hearing |
ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-06-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-06-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ARBITRATOR ROBERT A. HAWLEY APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION MAY-13-2011 THROUGH AUG-11-2011. | |
May 13, 2011 | Hearing |
ARBITRATOR JURISDICTION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 12, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO ARBITRATION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR RICHARD MICHAEL LIEBERMAN. | |
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR PAUL DANIEL GUTIERREZ. | |
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE MAY-12-2011. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.