Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Does 1 To 10, Mcdonald, Abigail C., represented by Heath, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Tomar Mason presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time476 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a case between Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. and Abigail C. McDonald. The document includes information about the case number, filing date, and the parties involved. It also provides deta...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCDONALD, ABIGAIL C.
Date: January 20, 2011NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT MCDONALD, ABIGAIL C.
Date: December 05, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 06, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MCDONALD, ABIGAIL C. | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT MCDONALD, ABIGAIL C. | |
November 15, 2011 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TOMAR MASON |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-15-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MCDONALD, ABIGAIL C. $30,261.95 PRINCIPAL, $1,575.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $1,946.88 INTEREST, $480.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $34,263.83, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER SHORT CAUSE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-19-2011. CASE SETTLED WITH THE JUDGE PRO TEM. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON NOV-15-2011 AT 10:00 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. MCDONALD, ABIGAIL C. | |
September 19, 2011 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR SHORT CAUSE
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.