Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rowbotham & Company, Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by O'Sullivan, Ciaran, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Tuft, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 03, 2010 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions96 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time110 days |
This complaint was filed by the law firm ROWBOTHAM & COMPANY, LLP against Melissa Tuft and others. The case number is CGC-10-505787 and the filing date is March 9, 2011. The document is a proof of service of summons, indicating that the defendant, Me...
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: March 09, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 03, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-08-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 15, 2011 | Hearing |
PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON MAR-15-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWBOTHAM & COMPANY, LLP SERVED DEC-09-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT TUFT, MELISSA | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR MAR-15-2011 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 610 | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROWBOTHAM & COMPANY, LLP AS TO DEFENDANT TUFT, MELISSA DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-08-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-01-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-24-2011 | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.