Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vasilogiorgis, Foula, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Sinclair, Richard C., against Alice A. Glazer, As Trustees Of The Glazer Living, Does 1 To 1-10, Donald A. Glazer, As Trustees Of The Glazer Living, Plm Lender Services, Inc., represented by Alabaster, Gary, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 24, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions198 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Case Cycle Time224 days |
This complaint was filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-10-505594 and the filing date is November 24, 2010. The plaintiff, Foula Vasilogiorgis, is suing Donald A. Glazer and Alice A. Glazer, as Tr...
ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: April 08, 2011ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO AND OSC
Date: November 29, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 24, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-18-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 03, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-18-2011 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUN-03-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TRO AND OSC, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF VASILOGIORGIS, FOULA | |
April 29, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-29-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-03-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ALICE A. GLAZER, AS TRUSTEES OF THE GLAZER LIVING DATED DECEMBER 30, 1987 | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.