Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
San Francisco Chronicle, A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Glassberg, Harold Burton, against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, U.A. Local 38 Convalescent Trust Fund, An, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 06, 2010 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions117 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time237 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: April 14, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 06, 2010DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE
Date: January 31, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-10-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 11, 2011 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-11-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-10-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHRONICLE, A CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHRONICLE, A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT U.A. LOCAL 38 CONVALESCENT TRUST FUND, AN INCORPORATED ASSOCIATION DBA KONOCTI HARBOR RESORT & SPA | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST CALCULATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN FRANCISCO CHRONICLE, A CORPORATION | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $495.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT U.A. LOCAL 38 CONVALESCENT TRUST FUND, AN INCORPORATED ASSOCIATION DBA KONOCTI HARBOR RESORT & SPA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.