Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brimer, Russell, filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case represented by Sheffer, Gregory M, against Does 1-600, Inclusive, Jack Schwartz Shoes, Inc., represented by Hile, Norman C, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2010 |
CategoryToxic Tort/Environment |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
Case Cycle Time202 days |
This complaint is a response from defendant Jack Schwartz Shoes, Inc. ("JSSI") to plaintiff Russell Brimer's complaint for civil penalties and injunctive relief. JSSI denies each and every allegation of the complaint and denies violating Proposition ...
THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: December 10, 2010ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON OCT-05-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: September 21, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 18, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JACK SCHWARTZ SHOES, INC.
Date: September 13, 2010ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 CONSENT TO JUDGMENT
Date: December 10, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2011 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-18-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED APPROVING PROP 65 CONSENT TO JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT PER TERMS OF PROP 65 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIMER, RUSSELL | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 CONSENT TO JUDGMENT | |
December 10, 2010 | Hearing |
Mtn To Approve Prop 65 Settlement And Proposed Consent Judgmnt
Judge: PETER J. BUSCH |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 301, PLAINTIFF RUSSELL BRIMER'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROP 65 SETTLEMENT AND PROPOSED CONSENT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. COUNSEL APPEARED IN COURT AND ANSWERED SOME INQUIRIES FROM THE COURT. THE COURT FINDS THE REFORMULATION AND WARNING PROVISIONS REASONABLE AND COMPLIANT WITH THE LAW. THE FEES AND PENALTY PROVISIONS ARE ALSO REASONABLE. ORDER AND JUGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: RONALD QUIDACHAY, REPORTER: ROBERT BALIAN, CSR # 5220 | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-10-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301 | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S MOTION TO APPROVE CONSENT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT JACK SCHWARTZ SHOES, INC. | |
November 19, 2010 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.