Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Rory W, against Does I To X, Inclusive, Warren, John, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions324 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time363 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: April 22, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF JUN-22-2011, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISSMISSAL AND POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC | |
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AGAINST RORY W. CLARK, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: APR-20-2011, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE MAY-05-2011. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-20-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-22-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 20, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR APR-20-2011 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 610 | |
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-19-2011 CONTINUED TO APR-20-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 19, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.