Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against Does 1 To 10, Santos, Katherine L, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 30, 2010 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions388 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time396 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF JUN-22-2011, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-22-2011 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW (212) | |
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT SANTOS, KATHERINE L | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (212) | |
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. SERVED JUN-02-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT SANTOS, KATHERINE L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.