Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robinson, Michael C, against Does 1 To 25, Incl., National Upholstering Company, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 01, 2010 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time90 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2010 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 06, 2010 | Hearing |
PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF JUL-30-2010, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON JUL-06-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DILIGENECE FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR JUL-06-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212 | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL UPHOLSTERING COMPANY DOES 1 TO 25, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-30-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-01-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-15-2010 | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.