Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Infinity Insurance Company, Taonus, Narrmayet, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lea, Michael R, against Does 1 To 20, Incl., Keiser, Brandi Gregg, Taonus, Narrmayet, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 11, 2010 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions266 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time599 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT KEISER, BRANDI GREGG
Date: December 02, 2010DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.
Date: March 07, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TAONUS, NARRMAYET
Date: April 30, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFY COPY OF JUDGMENT FACT RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT TO DMV FILED BY PLAINTIFF INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 08, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-08-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TAONUS, NARRMAYET $6,474.86 PRINCIPAL, $280.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,754.86, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-09-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-08-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE MAR-09-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 09, 2011 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. | |
December 29, 2010 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-29-2010 CONTINUED TO MAR-09-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE DEC-29-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.