Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sharpe, David, Sharpe, Hayley, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Farrise, Simona A, against B.R. Funsten & Company, Communication & Power Industries, Communication & Power Industries, Individually And, Does 1 Through 400, General Electric Company, (total of 17) See All represented by Judin, Jennifer, Keeney, Robert Charles, Lewis, Stephen Crawford, Marks, Christopher S., Mccall, Michael T, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time665 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case involves personal injury, property damage, or wrongful death, specifically related to asbestos litigation. The plaintiff/petitioner is David Sharpe, et al., and the defendant/respond...
DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 35934793) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Date: February 14, 2011NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 41124321) FILED BY ATTORNEY JUDIN, JENNIFER
Date: November 29, 2011NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 41123270) FILED BY ATTORNEY JUDIN, JENNIFER
Date: November 29, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 23, 2010NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 40184389) FILED BY ATTORNEY SHELDON, CHARLES T
Date: October 04, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35934793) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Date: February 14, 2011ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TID #46381450)
Date: September 11, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2012 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-18-2012. DISMISSAL ON FILE. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206) | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 46568642) | |
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TID #46381450) | |
September 04, 2012 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Pathology Materials For Testing
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-04-2012 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 503 | |
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | ASBESTOS DISCOVERY, 503, DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PATHOLOGY MATERIALS FOR TESTING. NO APPEARANCE AND TENTATIVE RULING ADOPTED: OFF CALENDAR. DEFENDANT WAS DISMISSED AUGUST 28. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON, MATTER NOT REPORTED | |
August 28, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 46138228) AS TO DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC., AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY AND ROSTONE CORPORATION ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC. | |
August 16, 2012 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO PLAINTIFF SET FOR OCT-18-2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. NO APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFF AT THE AUG-16-2012 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE. THE COURT ORDERED PLAINTIFF TO SHOW GOOD CAUSE FOR NON-APPEARANCE AT THE 8/16/12 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND FOR STATUS OF THE CASE. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK/R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.