Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Huynh, Alex, Huynh, Tiffany, Thai, Trinh, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carr, Dennis Michael, against Does 1 To 10, Molina, Armando, represented by Wang, Nathan N., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Tomar Mason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTomar Mason Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2009 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions632 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
VerdictPlaintiff |
Case Cycle Time632 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case filed by Trinh Thai and others against Armando Molina and others. The case number is CGC-09-495241 and the filing date is July 28, 2010. The document provides details of the ser...
MINUTES FOR SEP-06-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: September 06, 2011MINUTES FOR SEP-07-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: September 07, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 15, 2009MINUTES FOR SEP-08-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: September 08, 2011MINUTES FOR AUG-31-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: August 31, 2011MINUTES FOR SEP-02-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: September 02, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER TO REOPEN DISCOVERY FILED BY DEFENDANT MOLINA, ARMANDO
Date: August 24, 2011MINUTES FOR AUG-29-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: August 29, 2011MINUTES FOR SEP-01-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: September 01, 2011ORDER TO RE-OPEN DISCOVERY
Date: August 19, 2011MINUTES FOR AUG-30-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 606
Date: August 30, 2011ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY
Date: July 21, 2011EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: September 08, 2011WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: September 08, 2011EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: September 08, 2011JURY VERDICT
Date: September 08, 2011DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO PLAINTIFF HUYNH, TIFFANY HUYNH, ALEX
Date: September 08, 2011ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS OR TO TAX COSTS.
Date: December 14, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MOLINA, ARMANDO
Date: August 19, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS OR TO TAX COSTS. | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY DEFENDANT MOLINA, ARMANDO AS TO PLAINTIFF THAI, TRINH | |
December 05, 2011 | Hearing |
(Amended) Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Strike Memo Of Costs, Or In The Alt Mtn To Tax Costs
Judge: TOMAR MASON |
|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO STRIKE MEMO OF COSTS/ALT MTN TO TAX COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT MOLINA, ARMANDO | |
November 07, 2011 | Hearing |
(Amended) Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Strike Memo Of Costs, Or In The Alt Mtn To Tax Costs
Judge: TOMAR MASON |
|
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 514, (AMENDED) NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO STRIKE MEMO OF COSTS, OR IN THE ALT MTN TO TAX COSTS CONTINUED FROM NOV-07-2011 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION AT DEC-05-2011, 11:00 AM IN DEPT. 514 (PER STIPULATION DUE TO JUDGE MASON IS ON VACATION) | |
October 31, 2011 | Hearing |
(Amended) Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Strike Memo Of Costs, Or In The Alt Mtn To Tax Costs
Judge: TOMAR MASON |
|
October 31, 2011 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Memo Of Costs, Or In The Alternative To Tax Costs
Judge: TOMAR MASON |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 514, (AMENDED) NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO STRIKE MEMO OF COSTS, OR IN THE ALT MTN TO TAX COSTS CONTINUED FROM OCT-31-2011 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION AT NOV-07-2011, 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 (PER STIPULATION BY COUNSEL, JUDGE MASON IS ILL) | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | (AMENDED) NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO STRIKE MEMO OF COSTS, OR IN THE ALT MTN TO TAX COSTS, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT MOLINA, ARMANDO HEARING SET FOR OCT-31-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 514 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.