Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Littler Mendelson, P.C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bartlett, Robert Sumner, against Big Valley Ready Mix, Inc., Does 1 To 10, represented by Boutin, Stephen F, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 08, 2009 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time692 days |
This complaint is a document from a legal case filed by Littler Mendelson, P.C. against Big Valley Ready Mix, Inc. The case number is CGC-09-493261 and it was filed on December 4, 2009. The document is a proof of service of summons, indicating that t...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG VALLEY READY MIX, INC.
Date: December 17, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10
Date: February 11, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 08, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $4,938.29 INTEREST, $53.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. | |
March 12, 2010 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-12-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED; THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING STIPULATED JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BIG VALLEY READY MIX, INC. $27,080.34 PRINCIPAL, $1,000.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $4,068.09 INTEREST, $480.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $32,628.43, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. AS TO DEFENDANT BIG VALLEY READY MIX, INC. | |
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG VALLEY READY MIX, INC. | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BIG VALLEY READY MIX, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.