Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Slinsky, Lourdes, against Brounstei, Allison Lowe, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2009 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions199 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time216 days |
DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: December 18, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2010 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF JAN-27-2010, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-27-2010 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (212) | |
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(B FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395(B): VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT BROUNSTEI, ALLISON LOWE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-30-2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.