Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chase Manhattan Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reese, Harlan M, against Does 1 To 10, Leung, Peter, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 25, 2009 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions188 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time281 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, N.A. | |
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LEUNG, PETER $17,810.14 PRINCIPAL, $2,125.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $854.98 INTEREST, $384.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $21,174.12, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MIKE KONRATH RE: CCP 585 - AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, N.A. | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE SUMMARY FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, N.A. | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, COURT JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $384.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT LEUNG, PETER | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (212) | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT LEUNG, PETER | |
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (212) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.