Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chant, Andrew, Chant, Laura, Chant, Mason, Chant, Philip, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ribera, Sandra L, against Does 1 To 10, Fedex Ground Package System, Inc, Rodriguez Jr., Rafael Barrientos, represented by Hagan, Patrick Joseph, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ellen Chaitin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEllen Chaitin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions721 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time782 days |
This complaint is a document related to a legal case filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-09-485780, and it was filed on February 24, 2011. The plaintiffs in this case are Philip Chant, Laura Chan...
ORDER - STIPULATION FOR SEALING ORDER AND SEALING ORDER
Date: January 25, 2011DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2011ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ODER RE IMPROPER DEPOSITIONS AND DOCUMENT REQUESTS
Date: September 08, 2010ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE & ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT
Date: February 01, 2011ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RE-OPEN DISCOVERY
Date: September 09, 2010ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE & ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCK ACCOUNT
Date: February 01, 2011MINUTES FOR AUG-04-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 610
Date: August 04, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-15-2010 9:40 AM FOR DEPT 624
Date: November 15, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-02-2010 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 606
Date: November 02, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ JR., RAFAEL BARRIENTOS
Date: October 16, 2009SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CHANT, PHILIP CHANT, LAURA CHANT, ANDREW CHANT, MASON
Date: April 14, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 05, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC
Date: July 08, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RODRIGUEZ JR., RAFAEL BARRIENTOS
Date: October 16, 2009ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 14, 2010ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR LOST PROFITS
Date: October 06, 2010ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND REQUEST FOR STAY (A129358 DIV 2)
Date: August 19, 2010ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR OTHER RELIEF
Date: September 13, 2010ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: October 15, 2010ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND REQUEST FOR STAY (A130159 DIV 2)
Date: November 05, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2011 | Hearing |
Osc For Filing Receipt & Acknowlegment Of Order For Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account
Judge: ELLEN CHAITIN |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF APR-26-2011 OSC FOR FILING RECEIPT & ACKNOWLEGMENT OF ORDER FOR DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT OFF CALENDAR - RECEIPT FILED | |
April 05, 2011 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-05-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHANT, ANDREW | |
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHANT, MASON | |
February 15, 2011 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-15-2011 CONTINUED TO APR-05-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE & ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.