Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L, against Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Garcia, Susie A, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions497 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time558 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2010 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF AUG-04-2010, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (SWEEP) | |
June 02, 2010 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-02-2010 CONTINUED TO AUG-04-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE JUN-02-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY BRACHFELD, ERICA L | |
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 03, 2010 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR MAR-03-2010 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 212 | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-03-2010 CONTINUED TO JUN-02-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-03-2010 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.