Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jacobs, Kurtiss A, against Shapiro, Darren N., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions217 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time229 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-12-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-12-2009 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | NON SERVICE RETURN RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW. (212) | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | NON SERVICE/ RETURN FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT SHAPIRO, DARREN N. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-22-2009 | |
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION CCP 395 (B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.