Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alexander, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lee, Theodora Rochelle, Rorem, Mark Ohmer, Whiteman, William Douglas, against Bilo, Rob, Does 1 Thru 50, Incl., Nationwide Life Insurance Company, Nationwide Retirement Solutions, represented by Lee, Theodora Rochelle, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2008 |
CategoryWrongful Discharge |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time143 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Elizabeth Alexander against Nationwide Retirement Solutions and others. The complaint alleges sex discrimination, retaliation, disability discrimination, and infliction of emotional distress. Elizabeth Alex...
ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: April 16, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BILO, ROB
Date: March 17, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 19, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-22-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR NOTICE OF REMOVAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NTC TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT ON THE BASIS OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NTC TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT ON THE BASIS OF DIVERSITY JURISDICTION FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALEXANDER, ELIZABETH AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL. NATIONWIDE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALEXANDER, ELIZABETH | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BILO, ROB | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION (JOINT) FILED BY ALEXANDER, ELIZABETH NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS BILO, ROB | |
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | FIRST FILING FEE PAID FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE RETIREMENT SOLUTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.