Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert S, against Does 1 To 10, Meadows, Dina, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2008 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions164 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time192 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-13-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 22, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-13-2009 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE MAY-22-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NON-SERVICE/RETURN: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE TO PLTF; ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE; CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; JUDICIAL MEDIATION SERVICES INFORMATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC | |
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event | NON SERVICE /RETURN OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AS TO DEFENDANT MEADOWS, DINA | |
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event | COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC AS TO DEFENDANT MEADOWS, DINA DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-22-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-17-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-07-2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.