Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dibono, Victoria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Caldwell, Michael T, against Does 1 To 25, Incl., Koutolas, Basil, Koutoulas, Basil Sued As Basil Koutolas, represented by Maltz, Robert Mark, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2008 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions323 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time326 days |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KOUTOULAS, BASIL SUED AS BASIL KOUTOLAS
Date: October 14, 2008PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE APR-23-2009.
Date: April 13, 2009NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 11, 2008ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-24-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: August 03, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2009 | Hearing |
ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-24-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 19, 2009 | Hearing |
PRE-ARBITRATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM PRE-ARBITRATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-19-2009 AFTER CONFERENCE; MATTER DID NOT SETTLE. | |
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | ARBITRATOR WILLIAM JAMES O'CONNOR APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION APR-24-2009 THROUGH JUL-23-2009. | |
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-24-2009 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 24, 2009 | Hearing |
ARBITRATOR JURISDICTION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 23, 2009 | Hearing |
ORDER TO ARBITRATION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 23, 2009 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR JOHN SCOTT BURESH. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.