Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
National Credit Acceptance, Inc., A California, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pugh, John J, against Does 1 To 10 Inclusive, Ilagan, Casiano R, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2008 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time113 days |
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE
Date: November 13, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ILAGAN, CASIANO R $4,295.25 PRINCIPAL, $775.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $250.07 INTEREST, $238.95 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,559.27, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $238.95 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT ILAGAN, CASIANO R | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR JUDGMENT BY CLERK PURSUANT TO CCP 585 CCP 1033 AND LOST ORIGINAL DOCUMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY PUGH, JOHN J | |
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOHN J.PUGH WAIVING EXCESS ATTORNEY'S FEES PRAYED FOR IN THE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT - PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED SEP-29-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT ILAGAN, CASIANO R | |
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT ILAGAN, CASIANO R DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-09-2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.