Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Derman, Wayne, M. Karkori Construction, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Belote, Jeffrey Hartsfield, Sykes, Jeffrey Allan, against Karkori, Mostafa, M. Karkori Construction, Inc., M.Karkori Construction, Inc., A Purporated, represented by Jones, Craig Stanton, Wolff, George William, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Arlene T. Borick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArlene T. Borick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2008 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions546 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time596 days |
This complaint is a document related to a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-08-479247, and it was filed on October 22, 2008. The parties involved in the case are Wayne Derman, M. Karkori C...
REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A123242, DIV. 3)
Date: March 04, 2010DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE
Date: February 25, 2010ORDER EXPUNGING MECHANIC'S LIEN
Date: October 22, 2008NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: November 07, 2008ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE ON MOTION TO REMOVE MECHANIC'S LIEN
Date: October 29, 2008STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: October 29, 2008RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONS TO CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT
Date: November 20, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 28, 2008GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT KARKORI, MOSTAFA AN INDIVIDUAL M. KARKORI CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: September 15, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT M. KARKORI CONSTRUCTION, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Date: October 10, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2010 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-30-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A123242, DIV. 3) | |
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS | |
February 25, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BELOTE, JEFFREY HARTSFIELD SUBSTITUTED FOR BELOTE, JEFFREY HARTSFIELD AS ATTORNEY FOR DERMAN, WAYNE | |
January 29, 2010 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-29-2010 CONTINUED TO APR-30-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR STATUS OF APPEAL. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DERMAN, WAYNE ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS | |
September 25, 2009 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARLENE T. BORICK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.